IL SB1916 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of State Police.
Title
ST POLICE-SCENE INVESTIGATORS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |