IL SB1930 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Grow Your Own STEM and Vocational Education Teachers Act. Provides that a public institution of higher education shall, if funds are appropriated to the Board of Higher Education under the Act, waive any tuition, fees, and on-campus housing costs for a student who (i) agrees to pursue a minimum of a bachelor's degree in agriculture, science, technology, engineering, or mathematics for certain teaching occupations, (ii) agrees to attend a public institution of higher education to pursue an undergraduate degree or an advanced degree in one of those concentrations, (iii) agrees to teach at a hard-to-staff school, as determined by the Board of Higher Education, (iv) maintains a minimum 3.0 cumulative grade point average (or its equivalent) at all times, and (v) agrees to fully reimburse the public institution of higher education for any waived tuition, fees, or costs if the student fails to teach at least 3 years at a high school located in this State or at least 5 years at a public institution of higher education or a public community college located in this State. Provides that a public institution of higher education shall, if funds are appropriated to the Board of Higher Education under the Act, waive any tuition and fees for a student who is a licensed Illinois teacher with a master's degree and who (i) agrees to pursue up to a maximum of 18 graduate hours necessary to qualify the student to teach dual credit consistent with applicable accreditation and State standards for dual credit faculty and (ii) agrees to fully reimburse the public institution of higher education for any waived tuition or fees if the student fails to teach at least 5 years at a high school located in this State after the completion of the graduate hours. Requires the Board of Higher Education to adopt rules. Effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GROW STEM TEACHERS ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback