IL SB1937 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. In a Section concerning the debt limitations of school districts, adds language providing that, in addition to all other authority to issue bonds, Greenview Community Unit School District 200, Williamsville Community Unit School District 15, Elmwood Park Community Unit School District 401, and Maroa-Forsyth Community Unit School District 2 may issue bonds if the voters of those districts approve a proposition for the bond issuance and certain conditions are met. Provides that the debt incurred on the bonds shall not be considered indebtedness for purposes of any statutory debt limitation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL DISTRICTS-ISSUE BONDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0646
2020-06-26SenateEffective Date June 26, 2020
2020-06-26SenateGovernor Approved
2020-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2020-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2020-05-22SenateSenate Concurs
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2020-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 22, 2020
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2020-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-027-000
2020-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2020-05-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2020-05-21HouseLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-20HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2020-05-20HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-05-20HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-18SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1104915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1937&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0646.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1937ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1937_04102019_085000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1937_05222020_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1937ham003_05222020_003002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1937ham002_05222020_003001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1937ham001_05222020_003000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback