IL SB1939 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that a specified percentage of the net revenue generated from sales of motor fuel and gasohol shall be deposited into the Road Fund. Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the tax imposed on motor fuel shall be at the rate of 38 cents per gallon. Provides that the tax imposed on diesel shall be 7.5 cents per gallon. Makes changes concerning the distribution of proceeds. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in addition to any other tax that may be imposed, a municipality in a county with a population of over 3,000,000 inhabitants may also impose a tax on motor fuel at a rate not to exceed $0.03 per gallon. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases certain vehicle registration fees. Makes changes concerning notice of a parking, standing, or compliance violations. Provides that the notice shall include the vehicle make or a photograph of the vehicle (currently, vehicle make only). Makes changes concerning service of the notice. Amends the State Finance Act to create certain special funds. Amends the Counties Code to provide that the County Motor Fuel Tax Law also applies in Lake and Will Counties. Provides that the rate may not be less than 4 cents per gallon and not more than 8 cents per gallon. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall adjust the rate on July 1 of each year. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall set aside $50,000,000 received by the Department of Transportation from the Road Fund for the projects in the following categories: pedestrian and bicycle facilities and the conversion of abandoned railroad corridors to trails. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-APPROP FOR EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0032 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date June 28, 2019 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 048-009-001 |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-009-001 |
2019-06-02 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-06-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - June 2, 2019 |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-06-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-029-001 |
2019-06-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 (M1) Motion to Suspend Rule 15(d) - Prevailed |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 (M1) Moved to Suspend Rule 15(d)-Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-06-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 13.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |