IL SB1941 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes any changes to school discipline improvement plans. Gives the bill an immediate effective date.
Title
SAFE SCHOOLS/HEALTHY LEARNING
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0438 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.176 | New Code | See Bill Text |