IL SB1944 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of each municipality may require a defendant to complete an education program for each ordinance violation committed. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a vehicle owner may have to complete a traffic education program for a violation of the Illinois Vehicle Code or a local ordinance recorded by an automated traffic law enforcement system. In a provision authorizing municipalities to provide for a system of administrative adjudication for violations of parking, standing, compliance, and automated traffic laws, provides that the administrative system shall have the authority to adjudicate any civil offense carrying a fine not in excess of $250 or "requiring the completion of a traffic education program, or both". Provides that the notice of a parking, standing, compliance, or automated traffic law violation shall specify any requirement to complete a traffic education program. Specifies other notice requirements. In a provision pertaining to vehicle immobilization, adds that a vehicle shall be eligible for immobilization when the registered owner of the vehicle has failed to complete a specific number of traffic education programs as determined by ordinance. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD/VEHICLE CD-ED PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |