IL SB1944 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prenatal and Neonatal Congenital Toxoplasmosis Prevention and Treatment Act. Sets forth definitions. Provides that health care professionals shall provide counseling for Toxoplasmosis and testing for T. gondii when providing care to a pregnant woman during her pregnancy, unless the woman has been diagnosed prior to the pregnancy or she refuses, and during her delivery, unless she has already been determined to be IgG positive and chronically infected or she refuses. Sets forth circumstances under which every health care professional or facility caring for a newborn infant shall provide counseling and perform Toxoplasmosis testing. Sets forth subject matter requirements for the counseling required under the Act. Provides that consent for testing of a newborn infant shall be presumed when a health care professional or facility seeks to perform a test on a newborn infant whose mother's Toxoplasmosis status is unknown, provided that mandated counseling has taken place. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt necessary rules to implement the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PRENATAL TOXOPLASMOSIS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-002-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |