IL SB1944 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Hypodermic Syringes and Needles Act. Amends the Environmental Protection Act, the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
HYPODERMIC SYRINGES-PHARMACIES
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0326 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-012-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-002-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Remains in Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-008-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 3.458 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 600 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 600 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 635 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |