IL SB1970 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a student entitled to vote in a primary, general, special election, or any election at which propositions are submitted to a popular vote in this State is entitled to be absent from school for 2 hours to vote on a day in which early voting is offered or on the day of the election. Provides that the school may specify the hours in which the student may be absent. Provides that a student who is absent from school to vote is not considered absent for the purposes of calculating enrollment under evidence-based funding in the School Code.
Title
ELEC CODE-STUDENT VOTE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0624 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-10-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-10-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-10-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-10-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-10-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-010-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-002-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-001-003 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 17-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |