IL SB1972 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides, in provisions concerning master associations, that a purchaser of a unit at a judicial foreclosure sale, other than a mortgagee who takes possession pursuant to a court order or a purchaser who acquires title from a mortgagee, has the duty to pay the proportionate share of the common expenses for the unit during the 6 months immediately before the filing of an action to collect assessments and the association's costs of collection, including reasonable attorney's fees, (instead of an action to collect assessments) that remain unpaid by the prior owner. Provides that if the outstanding assessments and the association's costs of collection, including reasonable attorney's fees (instead of outstanding assessments) are paid during an action to collect assessments, the purchaser shall have no obligation to pay any assessments or costs (instead of any assessments) that accrued before he or she acquired title. Makes related changes.
Title
CONDO-FORECLOSURE-ATTY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0535 |
2011-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-05-20 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-20 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |