IL SB1972 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality or county may enact an ordinance providing for an automated traffic law enforcement system only at an intersection where, on average, 4 or more motor vehicle accidents that result in personal injury or injury to another occur each year. Provides that for each violation of the Code or a local ordinance recorded by an automated traffic law enforcement system in operation for a period of less than 30 days, the county or municipality having jurisdiction shall issue a notice of warning to the registered owner of the vehicle. Provides for the notice requirements. Provides that if a person who has never before received a notice of a violation of the Code or a local ordinance recorded by an automated traffic law enforcement system in operation for more than 30 days receives more than one notice of violation within a 21-day period for separate traffic violations, he or she may pay the fine associated with the first notice of violation in satisfaction of all of the remaining fines.
Title
VEH CD-REDLIGHT CAMERA-NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1972&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1972.htm |