IL SB1993 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language providing that each diesel-powered vehicle that is registered for a gross weight of more than 16,000 pounds or has a gross vehicle weight rating of more than 16,000 pounds and that is operated by an interstate carrier of property is subject to provisions that pertain to diesel emission inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-DIESEL EMISSIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0362
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625513-114Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback