IL SB2016 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that, in addition to any other funding that may be provided to the Illinois Transportation Enhancement Program (ITEP) from federal, State, or other sources, the Department of Transportation shall set aside an amount equal to 2% of the total appropriation received by the Department from the Road Fund for the projects in the categories of pedestrian and bicycle facilities, streetscape projects, and the conversion of abandoned railroad corridors to trails. Provides that the funds shall be administered according to the requirements of the current Guidelines Manual published by the Department for ITEP. Provides that, for projects funded under the Section: (1) local matching funding shall be required according to a sliding scale based on community size, median income, and total property tax base, (2) Phase I Studies and Phase I Engineering Reports are not required to be completed before application is made, and (3) at least 25% of funding shall be directed towards projects in high-need communities. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules necessary to implement the Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ITEP DOT SUPPLEMENTAL FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
202705615New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback