IL SB2020 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Inter-Agency Report on Decarbonization and Economic Opportunities Act. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Commerce Commission, the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, and the Illinois Power Agency to work jointly to design a broad-based policy approach, including specific programs, to decarbonize Illinois' electric sector (including energy production and consumption) in a just and equitable way that puts our State on track to phase out polluting power plants by 2030 and create new economic opportunities across the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DECARBONIZATION-REPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2019
2019-03-14SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback