IL SB2021 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Medicaid Eligibility Determination and Renewal Reform Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services (Department) to work with the Department of Human Services to achieve the following goals related to eligibility determinations and renewals under the Medical Assistance Program: (i) reduce procedural terminations so that no more than 10% of medical assistance beneficiaries who remain eligible for medical assistance experience any lapse in contemporaneous medical coverage; and (ii) use technology to lower administrative burdens and increase beneficiary continuity of coverage by providing real-time eligibility determination decisions for at least 75% of all medical assistance applicants, increasing automatic renewals for medical assistance beneficiaries, and offering an electronic means by which medical assistance beneficiaries can track and maintain their benefits. Provides that the goals must be meet by December 31, 2020. Requires the Department to submit Medicaid and CHIP State Plan amendments to implement express lane eligibility for all beneficiaries of medical assistance and benefits under the Children's Health Insurance Program Act. Contains provisions concerning community-based enrollment and redetermination assistance; the creation of enhanced user permission; and other matters. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department to reduce administrative burdens and minimize delay utilizing its income, residency, and identity verification system; and to utilize federal or State electronic data sources to obtain certain financial, employment, and residency information. Contains provisions concerning data matching; the waiver of residency verification requirements; rulemaking authority; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID ELIGIBILITY REFORMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2021&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2021.htm |