IL SB2026 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Failed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Prohibits the State from applying for any federal waiver that would reduce or eliminate any protection or coverage required under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (ACA) that was in effect on January 1, 2017, including, but not limited to, any protection for persons with pre-existing conditions and coverage for services identified as essential health benefits under the ACA. Provides that the State or an agency of the executive branch may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through joint resolution. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Prohibits the State from applying for any federal waiver that would permit an individual or group health insurance plan to reduce or eliminate any protection or coverage required under the ACA that was in effect on January 1, 2017, including, but not limited to, any protection for persons with pre-existing conditions and coverage for services identified as essential health benefits under the ACA. Provides that the State or an agency of the executive branch may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through joint resolution. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Prohibits the State or an agency of the executive branch from applying for any federal Medicaid waiver that would result in more restrictive standards, methodologies, procedures, or other requirements than those that were in effect in Illinois as of January 1, 2017 for the Medical Assistance Program, the Children's Health Insurance Program, or any other medical assistance program in Illinois operating under any existing federal waiver authorized by specified provisions of the Social Security Act. Provides that the State or an agency of the executive branch may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through joint resolution. Effective immediately.
Title
CMS-DHFS-ACA PROTECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Lost 027-023-001 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto October 29, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-041-000 |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-005-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |