IL SB2027 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Codifies the findings and recommendations of the Mahomet Aquifer Task Force established under P.A. 100-0403. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall identify unlined, thinly covered legacy landfills for inspection and study the landfills after prioritizing them based on potential hazards to surface water and groundwater resources. Prescribes required qualifications for Agency inspectors designated to identify and inspect legacy landfills. Provides that the Agency shall collect and archive information about landfills for present and long-term use, including manifests and engineering records. Provides that the Agency shall assemble location information about industries and companies that generate waste and that the resulting records should be available for use as confidential information by regulatory agencies but shall not be subject to the Freedom of Information Act. Amends the Illinois Groundwater Protection Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Agency, in consultation and cooperation with the Illinois State Geological Survey and the Illinois State Water Survey, shall design and implement a Pilot Project at the Pekin Metro Landfill in Tazewell County, to be completed by December 31, 2020. Provides that the Pilot Program shall perform specified tasks.
Title
EPA-MAHOMET AQUIFER
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0573 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 031-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 21.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 55 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |