IL SB2035 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Modifies the percentages of the total dollar amount of State contracts required to be established as an aspirational goal to be awarded to businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to by rule further establish committed diversity aspirational goals (currently, numbers) for State contracts awarded to businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities. Removes requirement specifying that the additional diversity aspiration goals shall (1) an increase in the percentage of State contracts required to be awarded and (2) an increase in contract spending with certified businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities. Makes conforming changes.
Title
BEP-CONTRACT DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |