IL SB2050 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of developmental disabilities awareness decals for Universal special license plates by the Department of Human Services. Provides fees for the decals. Creates the Developmental Disabilities Awareness Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that money in the Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois Department of Human Services to fund legal aid groups to assist with guardianship fees for private citizens willing to become guardians for individuals with developmental disabilities but who are unable to pay the legal fees associated with becoming a guardian. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-DISABILITIES AWARENESS
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |