IL SB2060 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision requiring a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board to adopt a policy setting forth goals for the utilization of emerging investment managers, provides that the goals established shall be based on the percentage of total fees paid under (instead of the total dollar amount of) investment contracts let to minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, and businesses owned by a person with a disability. Requires the goals to be established on or before January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-INVESTMENT GOALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Accountability and Ethics; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |