IL SB2067 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois. Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 academic year, each university must accept any academic credits from a student who transfers to the university from a senior military college or a military junior college.
Title
HGHR ED-MILITARY COLL TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |