IL SB2075 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but provides that the compulsory school age beginning with the 2020-2021 school year applies to a child who is 5 years of age on or before May 31 (rather than on or before September 1). Makes a related change.
Title
SCH CD-COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-002-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-005-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.19a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |