IL SB2081 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Creates the Forensic Science Act. Provides that a convicted person may file a petition for relief based on relevant forensic scientific evidence that was not available to be offered at the convicted person's trial or entry of judgment, plea of guilty, or plea of nolo contendere or that undermines forensic scientific evidence relied upon by the prosecution at trial. Prescribes what shall be included in a petition for relief under the Act. Provides that, upon reviewing a petition, a court shall grant relief to the petitioner if the court finds that, had the forensic scientific evidence been presented at trial or entry of judgment, plea of guilty, or plea of nolo contendere, there is a reasonable likelihood the petitioner would not have been convicted. Provides that, in making a finding as to whether relevant forensic scientific evidence was not ascertainable through the exercise of reasonable diligence on or before a specific date, the court shall consider whether the relevant forensic scientific evidence has changed since the applicable trial date or dates, or date of entry of judgment, plea of guilty, or plea of nolo contendere, for a determination made with respect to an original application, or the date on which the original application or a previously considered application, as applicable, was filed, for a determination made with respect to a subsequent application. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-FORENSIC SCIENCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback