IL SB2085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0574
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance or managed care organization that provides mental health benefits to provide reimbursement for benefits that are delivered through the psychiatric Collaborative Care Model. Provides that an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance or managed care organization that provides mental health benefits may deny reimbursement of any current procedural terminology code listed on the grounds of medical necessity if medical necessity determinations are in compliance with federal law and related regulations. Makes conforming changes to the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-COLLABORATIVE CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0574
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
2019-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-004-000
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 018-001-000
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-16.8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2085&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2085.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2085eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2085enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0574.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2085sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2085ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2085_04102019_099000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB2085_05232019_066000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2085ham001_05302019_047000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback