IL SB2089 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Student Online Personal Protection Act of 2019. Provides for legislative intent and definitions. Provides for operator prohibitions, operator duties, school authority prohibitions, school authority duties, State Board of Education duties, and parent rights. Creates the Student Data Protection Oversight Committee and provides for the Committee's membership and support. Requires the Committee to submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the State Board of Education with recommendations, if any, for policy revisions and legislative amendments that would carry out the intent of the Act. Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Adds a definition of record. Requires written consent of a student's parent to publish student directories that list student names, addresses, and other identifying information and similar publications. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to make a conforming change. Repeals the Student Online Personal Protection Act. Effective immediately.
Title
STUDENT ONLINE PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 85 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2089&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2089.htm |