IL SB2090 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that each election authority shall collaborate with the county jail within the jurisdiction of the election authority to facilitate voting by mail for voters eligible to vote in the county who are confined or detained in the county jail. Provides that in a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more, the election authority in the county shall establish a temporary branch polling place in the county jail. Provides that a refusal by an eligible voter to participate in the voting process must be documented by the voter or witnessed by a pollwatcher. Provides that individuals who facilitate a vote by mail process must receive training on the process, responsibilities, and requirements of implementing a vote by mail program. Contains additional provisions concerning the temporary branch polling place in the county jail. Prohibits certain individuals from from being election judges in a temporary branch polling place in a county jail. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that each election authority shall collaborate with the county jail within the jurisdiction of the election authority to facilitate voter registration for voters eligible to vote in that county who are confined or detained in the county jail. Provides that a county jail shall provide a voter registration application to any person in custody at the jail who requests an application and is eligible to vote. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that upon release of a person who is eligible to vote, the Department of Corrections shall provide the person with a specified form that informs him or her that his or her voting rights have been restored. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections and Counties Code. Provides that upon discharge from a county jail or release from the Department of Corrections, a person shall be provided with a voter registration form. Provides that the Department, each county jail, and each county probation office shall provide an individual in its custody with specified information on voting rights. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JAILS-PRISONS-VOTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0442
2019-08-21SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-21SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 069-045-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-05-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 013-005-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-2.3New CodeSee Bill Text
10519A-20Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-15003.3New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-15003.4New CodeSee Bill Text
73053-14-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-2-2.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback