IL SB2091 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Changes the definition of "early childhood degree program". Provides that if a student chooses to enroll in a private institution, the grant awarded to the student under the program shall be no more than 150% of the highest rate paid on behalf of students in a similar program at a public institution to cover the cost of tuition and mandatory fees, less all other student aid. Provides that after completion of or disenrolling from his or her program of study, a student must reside and work within this State in a child care or early childhood education setting for a minimum of one year. Provides that if the student does not reside and work within this State for a minimum of one year, the student must repay the total grant amount awarded to him or her through installments in accordance with rules adopted by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Creates the Early Childhood Workforce Free College Advisory Committee (rather than the Early Childhood Workforce Committee), established by the Illinois Early Learning Council; changes the membership of the Committee and the Committee's duties. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HGHR ED-EARLY CHILDHOOD GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 007-005-001 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 65.105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |