IL SB2093 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Airport Authorities Act. Creates the Northern Illinois Airport Authority within Lake County with the primary purpose of continuing to maintain, develop, and operate the Waukegan National Airport and the Waukegan Marina and Harbor. Provides that the Authority is established 30 days after the appointment of board members to the board of commissioners of the Authority and certification by the Secretary of State. Provides that the Waukegan Port District is dissolved upon the establishment of the Authority with the Authority assuming the rights to all property, assets, and liabilities of the Waukegan Port District. Repeals the Waukegan Port District Act.
Title
NORTHERN ILLINOIS AIRPORT AUTH
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1865 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
70 | 5 | 2.7.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2093&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2093.htm |