IL SB2104 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Pharmacy Practice Act from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2023. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Extends the repeal date of provisions concerning the Collaborative Pharmaceutical Task Force from November 1, 2020 to November 1, 2021. Adds members to the Task Force and requires the Task Force to vote on additional recommendations on October 1, 2020. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, in direct consultation with the Task Force, to propose rules for adoption. Deletes language providing that a registered pharmacy technician may assist in the practice of pharmacy and perform specified functions. Provides, with exceptions, that a registered pharmacy technician may be delegated to perform any task within the practice of pharmacy if specifically trained for that task. Makes changes to the training requirements of pharmacy technicians. Provides requirements for working conditions for pharmacies. Requires a patient or patient's agent to enroll a prescription in an auto-refill program before the prescription may be included in an auto-refill program with a refill on file. Beginning January 1, 2021, requires a pharmacy using specified standards for receiving electronic prescriptions to enable, activate, and maintain the ability to receive transmissions and to transmit cancellations for electronic prescriptions. Requires a pharmacy to respond to a cancellation transmission of a prescription. Requires the Department to adopt rules implementing the provisions to ensure that discontinued medications are not dispensed, whether prescribed through an electronic or paper prescription. Provides that a waiver for continuing pharmacy education requirements may be granted for not more than one of any 2 (rather than 3) consecutive renewal periods. Provides that all pharmacies shall maintain an up-to-date training program policies and procedures manual (rather than an up-to-date training program). Provides for additional violations that the Department may enforce with disciplinary action. Repeals provisions regarding references to the Director or Department of Professional Regulation, rosters, and disciplinary consent orders. Makes other changes. Effective immediately, except that the changes to the Pharmacy Practice Act take effect January 1, 2020.
Title
PHARMACY PRACTICE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0621 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020; ; Some provisions |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2019; ; Some provisions |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-11-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-11-13 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-11-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-002 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-001 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 155.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 308 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2M | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |