IL SB2117 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language requiring registration of certain farm wagon type trailers having a fertilizer spreader attachment and farm wagon type tank trailers. Removes the registration fee and existing width and weight restrictions for single unit self-propelled agricultural fertilizer implements.
Title
VEH CD-FARM MACHINERY FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |