IL SB2123 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Equitable Energy Financing Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to establish the Equitable Energy Financing Program for all electric utilities in this State to permit customers to finance the construction of energy projects through an optional tariff payable directly through their utility bill. Provides that the Program shall offer to make investments in energy projects to customer properties with low-cost capital and use an opt-in tariff to recover the costs. Provides that the Program will allow residential electric utility customers that own the property, or renters that have a long-term lease on the property, for which they subscribe to utility service, to purchase an energy project. Provides further requirements for the Program and requirements for the Commission concerning the Program. Provides for customer protections and cost-effectiveness requirements under the Program. Provides Program participation requirements for electric utilities in this State. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY-PAY AS YOU SAVE PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |