IL SB2126 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Public Community College Act. Moves provisions governing classes for adults and youths whose schooling has been interrupted from the School Code to the Public Community College Act. Amends the Adult Education Act. Defines "Adult Education" (rather than "Adult and Continuing Education") to mean academic instruction and educational services below the postsecondary level that increase an individual's ability to (i) read, write, and speak in English and perform mathematics or other activities necessary for the attainment of a secondary school diploma or its recognized equivalent and (ii) transition to postsecondary education and training or obtain employment. Provides for apportionment for adult education courses for the instruction of those persons who (i) are 16 years of age or older, are not enrolled or required to be enrolled in a secondary school under State law, and are basic-skills deficient, (ii) do not have a secondary school diploma or its recognized equivalent and have not achieved an equivalent level of education, or (iii) are an English language learner (rather than persons over 21 years of age and youths under 21 years of age whose schooling has been interrupted). Repeals the Adult Education Reporting Act. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ICCB-ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto October 29, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 405 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 405 | 3-3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 410 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 2-12.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |