IL SB2128 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reports Act of 1984. Changes the short title of the Act to the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters and Voice Writer Reporters Act. Allows for certification of voice writer reporters. Changes the name of the Certified Shorthand Reporters Board to the Certified Shorthand Reporters and Voice Writer Reporters Board and increases the Board to 9 members (rather than 7) with the addition of 2 certified voice writer reporters. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act and various other Acts. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that unless a verbatim record of the testimony or deposition is prepared and certified by an individual certified under the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters and Voice Writer Reporters Act, no testimony taken by deposition shall be offered in any court and no testimony offered in the record of administrative proceedings shall be offered. Provides that testimony taken outside of the State shall be deemed to be in conformity with the provisions if the testimony was prepared and certified by a court reporter authorized to prepare and certify deposition testimony in the jurisdiction in which the testimony was taken.
Title
CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto October 29, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 415 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 415 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |