IL SB2133 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that "private information" includes, but is not limited to, the name and any identifying information of a victim in a sexual assault investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-PRIVATE INFO DEFINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51402Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback