IL SB2151 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that registered professional nursing practice is a scientific process founded on a professional body of knowledge; it is a learned profession based on the understanding of the human condition across the life span and environment and includes all nursing specialties and means the performance of any nursing act based upon professional knowledge, judgment, and skills acquired by means of completion of an approved professional nursing education program. Provides that registered professional nurses may delegate nursing interventions and tasks (rather than nursing interventions) to other registered professional nurses and licensed practical nurses and may delegate tasks to unlicensed personnel based on the comprehensive nursing assessment. Removes provisions concerning delegation of nursing interventions and administration of medications in community-based or in-home care settings. Provides that a registered professional nurse may delegate tasks to other licensed and unlicensed persons. Makes other changes. Effective August 1, 2019.
Title
NURSING-DELEGATION
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Licensed Activities |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Re-assigned to Licensed Activities |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |