IL SB2242 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employee Sick Leave Act. Permits an employee to use personal sick leave benefits for leave an employee is entitled to under the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Permits an employer to limit the use of personal sick leave benefits for leave an employee is entitled to under the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Provides that the Employee Sick Leave Act does not limit or extend the period of leave to which an employee is entitled under the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act, regardless of whether the employee receives sick leave compensation during that leave. Effective immediately.
Title
EMPLOYEE SICK LEAVE BENEFITS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 191 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 191 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2242&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2242.htm |