IL SB2252 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that nothing in the Illinois Municipal Code shall be construed as to prevent a municipality from enforcing zoning regulations concerning facilities regulated under the Livestock Management Facilities Act if the facility is located within 1.5 miles of the municipality.
Title
MUNI CODE-LIVESTOCK MANAGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |