IL SB2254 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-TRANSPORTATION
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.892 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.893 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1184 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 1-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 4-304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-1-19 | New Code | See Bill Text |