IL SB2273 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Automatic Listening Exploitation Act. Defines terms. Provides that it is unlawful for a person who provides any smart service through a proprietary smart speaker to: (i) store or make a recording or transcript of any speech or sound captured by a smart speaker or to use any storage or recording or transcript of any voice interaction by a user with the voice-user interface, or (ii) transmit such a recording or transcript to a third party, for any purpose, without obtaining express informed consent and permitting the user to require the deletion of any recording, transcript, or sound recorded by the speaker at any time. Provides exemptions. Provides that it is unlawful for a person who provides any security monitoring or other service through a proprietary video doorbell to: (i) store or make a recording of any video, image, or audio captured by the video doorbell's camera, or (ii) use any storage recording of any video, image, or audio captured by the video doorbell's camera, or transmit such a recording to a third party. Provides exemptions. Provides that, if the Attorney General or a State's Attorney has reason to believe that any person has violated or is violating the Act, he or she may, in addition to any authority he or she may have to bring an action in State court under consumer protection law, bring a civil action in any court of competent jurisdiction to enjoin further violation by the defendant, enforce compliance with the Act, or obtain civil penalties not to exceed $40,000 per violation.
Title
AUTOMATIC LISTENING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2273&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2273.htm |