IL SB2290 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to publish on its website online textbooks and supplementary learning materials, including faculty resources, for the 20 most common courses taught at community colleges for any community college student or faculty member to access free of charge and without limitation. Requires the Board to consult with community college faculty members in the development of these online textbooks and materials. Requires the online textbooks and materials to be published no later than December 1, 2020 and to be updated, as the Board determines is necessary, on an annual basis. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL BD-ONLINE TEXTBOOKS
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2290&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2290.htm |