IL SB2310 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Government Severance Pay Act. Provides that a contract containing a severance pay provision must include, among other requirements, a requirement that if a provision to transition into a different position is included in the contract, then the contract must include a provision that compensation may not exceed the annual compensation of the highest paid employee in the relevant department to which a person is transitioning. Specifies that the provisions are declarative of existing law and shall not be construed as a new enactment. Modifies the definition of "severance pay". Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT SEVERANCE PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 415 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 415 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |