IL SB2325 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Raffles and Poker Runs Act. Authorizes fire protection agencies and statewide associations that represent fire protection agencies to organize raffles. Provides that raffles organized by a fire protection agency or statewide association that represents fire protection agencies must only be licensed by the governing body of the county or municipality in which the key location for that raffle is located, even if raffle tickets are sold beyond the borders of that governing body of the county or municipality. Provides that raffles organized by a fire protection agency or a statewide association that represents fire protection agencies must abide by any restrictions established by the governing body of the county or municipality in which the key location is located.
Title
RAFFLE/POKER RUN-FIRE AGENCY
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-001 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-001 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 15 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |