IL SB2328 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall create and maintain an online database and resource page on its website. Provides that the database and resource page shall contain mental health resources specifically geared toward post-secondary social workers, counselors, parents, faculty, graduate assistants, school administrators, graduate and undergraduate students, and support personnel with the goal of connecting those people with mental health resources related to crisis services, wellness, sexual health, survivor support, gender-based violence, nutrition, stress reduction, anxiety, depression, violence prevention, suicide prevention, and substance use and encouraging information sharing among educational administrators, security personnel, resource officers, faculty, students, and all other employees of a university or college. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDDAA-MENT HLTH DATABASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |