IL SB2340 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a prescriber who is licensed to prescribe controlled substances shall, prior to issuing a prescription for an opioid that is a Schedule II controlled substance, discuss with a patient who is under 18 years of age and is an emancipated minor, or with the patient's parent or guardian if the patient is under 18 years of age and is not an emancipated minor, the risks of developing a physical or psychological dependence on the opioid and, if the prescriber deems it appropriate, any alternative treatments as may be available. Provides that a prescriber who engages in a discussion required under this provision shall include a note in the patient's medical record indicating that the discussion took place. Provides that the discussion required under this provision shall not be required prior to issuing a prescription to any patient who is currently receiving hospice care from a comprehensive hospice licensed under the Hospice Program Licensing Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-OPIOID
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |