IL SB2341 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the county board of Lake County, by ordinance, or the voters of Lake County, by backdoor referendum, may vote to discontinue all offices of the township assessor in the county. Provides petition and referendum requirements. Provides that after the adoption of an ordinance, or after the approval of a backdoor referendum, to discontinue all offices of township assessor in Lake County, the office of township assessor is discontinued in each township at the end of each township assessor's term. Provides that at the end of each township assessor's term: (i) the Chief County Assessment Officer of Lake County assumes the duties of the township assessor; (ii) the county board members become the board of health for any public health district in the township; and (iii) the office of the township collector of the township ceases and the county treasurer assumes the duties of the township collector. Amends the Public Health District Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TOWNSHIP ASSESSORS-LAKE COUNTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 19-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 2.5-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 2.5-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 3-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | Art. 2.5 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 905 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |