IL SB2463 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no person who has served as a statewide elected official, the executive or administrative head of a State agency, the deputy executive or administrative head of a State agency, or a member of the General Assembly shall, within 2 years after the termination of service or employment, become a lobbyist. Defines "lobbyist".
Title
LOBBYIST-REVOLVING DOOR BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2463&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2463.htm |