IL SB2471 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that "step-parent" includes a person joined in a civil union to a child's parent. Deletes language providing that: all counseling sessions shall be confidential; and communications in counseling shall not be used in any manner in litigation nor relied upon by any expert appointed by the court or retained by any party. Effective immediately.
Title
IMDMA-STEP-PARENT; COUNSELING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 602.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 607.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2471&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2471.htm |