IL SB2478 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that through June 30, 2022 (instead of June 30, 2020), an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-RETURN TO SERVICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2478&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2478.htm |