IL SB2481 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the term "selling price" no longer includes the value of traded-in motor vehicles. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. In a Section concerning the use tax on motor vehicles, makes changes concerning the amount of the tax. Provides that the tax on motorcycles, motor driven cycles, and mopeds shall be the same as for all other motor vehicles. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VEHICLES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-01-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-001 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |