IL SB2484 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the medical assistance program shall cover charges incurred, and anesthetics provided, in conjunction with dental care that is provided to an individual in a hospital or an ambulatory surgical treatment center if the individual is otherwise eligible for medical assistance and any of the following applies: (1) the individual has a medical condition that requires hospitalization or general anesthesia for dental care; or (2) the individual is a person with a disability. Defines "person with a disability" to mean a person, regardless of age, with a chronic disability if the chronic disability meets specified conditions. Provides that the medical assistance program shall cover charges incurred, and anesthetics provided by a dentist with a permit provided under the Illinois Dental Practice Act, in conjunction with dental care that is provided to an individual in a dental office, oral surgeon's office, hospital, or ambulatory surgical treatment center if the individual, regardless of age, is otherwise eligible for medical assistance and has been diagnosed with (i) an autism spectrum disorder as defined in the Autism Spectrum Disorders Reporting Act or (ii) a developmental disability. Defines "developmental disability". Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to reimburse providers of services covered under the amendatory Act at the same rates as the Medicare program's rates for similar services.
Title
MEDICAID-ADJUNCTIVE DENTAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2484&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2484.htm |